Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 836 Today
» 871 Yesterday
» 836 Week
» 21818 Month
» 163772 Year
» 1048153 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GNR 1405   06/1905
LNER (1924) 4405   24/01/1925
LNER (1946) 2835   16/10/1946

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class C1
Company History GNR/LNER
Wheels 4-4-2
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 241
Works Number 1080
To Service During 06/1905
Withdrawal Thu 14/08/1947
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Darlington)
Service Life 42 yrs, 2 mths , 14 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
   Withdrawn 14/08/1947

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN GRA Grantham 14/08/1947

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 1909 06/1909   General
Boiler number 1593 (Diagram 1)
 
Doncaster Works 1913 06/1913   General
Boiler number 6777 (Diagram 1)
 
Doncaster Works 1914 04/1914   General
Superheated boiler fitted
Boiler number 6803 (Diagram 1)
 
Doncaster Works 1919 07/1919   General
Boiler number 1670 (Diagram 1)
 
Doncaster Works 14/11/1922 17/02/1923 96 days General  
Doncaster Works 12/10/1923 05/01/1924 86 days Heavy  
Doncaster Works 09/10/1924 24/01/1925 108 days General
Boiler number 7728 (Diagram 1)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4405
 
Doncaster Works 15/06/1925 15/08/1925 62 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 15/02/1926 10/07/1926 146 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 30/06/1927 18/10/1927 111 days General  
Doncaster Works 29/06/1929 10/08/1929 43 days General  
Doncaster Works 06/06/1931 25/07/1931 50 days General  
Doncaster Works 21/10/1933 25/11/1933 36 days General
Boiler number 8669 (Diagram 1)
 
Doncaster Works 28/09/1935 26/10/1935 29 days General  
Doncaster Works 31/10/1935 16/11/1935 17 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 12/02/1938 12/03/1938 29 days General
Boiler number 8235 (Diagram 1)
 
Doncaster Works 26/07/1941 13/09/1941 50 days General  
Doncaster Works 07/08/1943 28/08/1943 22 days Light Repair
After collision
 
Doncaster Works 26/08/1944 23/09/1944 29 days General  
Doncaster Works 27/03/1946 29/04/1946 34 days General  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also

prev prev