|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 1910 | 04/1910 | General | ||||
Doncaster Works | 1914 | 04/1914 | General | Superheated boiler fitted |
|||
Doncaster Works | 1921 | 10/1921 | General | ||||
Doncaster Works | 27/11/1922 | 29/03/1923 | 123 days | General | Hulburd mechanical lubricator fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 26/02/1924 | 31/05/1924 | 96 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4406 |
||
Doncaster Works | 10/03/1926 | 23/07/1926 | 136 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/03/1928 | 07/06/1928 | 84 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/01/1930 | 22/02/1930 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 20/09/1930 | 18/10/1930 | 29 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/10/1932 | 10/12/1932 | 63 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/07/1934 | 08/09/1934 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 15/02/1936 | 14/03/1936 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 26/06/1937 | 07/08/1937 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/08/1939 | 30/09/1939 | 57 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/10/1941 | 29/11/1941 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/09/1942 | 24/10/1942 | 43 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/12/1943 | 25/12/1943 | 22 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/04/1944 | 22/04/1944 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/01/1946 | 27/01/1946 | 1 day | No repairs |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1905 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1406 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1082 |
||
1910 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1910. Dep: ?/04/1910. | ||
1914 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1914. Dep: ?/04/1914. Work undertaken: Superheated boiler fitted |
||
1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1921. Dep: ?/10/1921. | ||
27/11/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/11/1922. Dep: 29/03/1923. Work undertaken: Hulburd mechanical lubricator fitted |
||
26/02/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/02/1924. Dep: 31/05/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4406 |
||
08/06/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
10/03/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/03/1926. Dep: 23/07/1926. | ||
16/03/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/03/1928. Dep: 07/06/1928. | ||
11/01/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/01/1930. Dep: 22/02/1930. | ||
20/09/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/09/1930. Dep: 18/10/1930. | ||
09/10/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/10/1932. Dep: 10/12/1932. | ||
28/07/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/07/1934. Dep: 08/09/1934. | ||
15/02/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/02/1936. Dep: 14/03/1936. | ||
26/06/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/06/1937. Dep: 07/08/1937. | ||
05/08/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/08/1939. Dep: 30/09/1939. | ||
18/10/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/10/1941. Dep: 29/11/1941. | ||
12/09/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/09/1942. Dep: 24/10/1942. | ||
04/12/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/12/1943. Dep: 25/12/1943. | ||
08/04/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/04/1944. Dep: 22/04/1944. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 2836 but not taken up | ||
27/01/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (No repairs) - Arr: 27/01/1946. Dep: 27/01/1946. | ||
16/02/1946 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 4406 |