Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 1 Today
» 954 Yesterday
» 2862 Week
» 21644 Month
» 269937 Year
» 1154318 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GNR 1408   07/1905
LNER (1924) 4408   26/08/1924
LNER (1946) 2838   Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class C1
Company History GNR/LNER
Wheels 4-4-2
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 241
Works Number 1084
To Service During 07/1905
Withdrawal Thu 26/07/1945
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Service Life 40 yrs , 26 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
KX Kings Cross 26/08/1924
NWE New England 07/04/1925
CAM Cambridge 07/01/1928
NWE New England 24/05/1928
CLK Colwick 06/10/1941
   Withdrawn 26/07/1945

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 1915 01/1915   General
Boiler number 1580 (Diagram 1)
 
Doncaster Works 1921 11/1921   General
Superheated boiler fitted
Boiler number 6771 (Diagram 1)
 
Doncaster Works 05/10/1922 04/11/1922 31 days General  
Doncaster Works 12/05/1924 26/08/1924 107 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4408
 
Doncaster Works 26/01/1925 04/04/1925 69 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 15/12/1925 15/01/1926 32 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 09/04/1927 23/07/1927 106 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 15/06/1929 03/08/1929 50 days General
Boiler number 8236 (Diagram 1)
 
Doncaster Works 30/05/1931 11/07/1931 43 days General  
Doncaster Works 25/06/1932 16/07/1932 22 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 14/10/1933 16/12/1933 64 days General  
Doncaster Works 16/11/1935 14/12/1935 29 days General
Boiler number 8046 (Diagram 1)
 
Doncaster Works 07/05/1938 11/06/1938 36 days General  
Doncaster Works 14/09/1940 19/10/1940 36 days General
Boiler number 8668 (Diagram 1)
 
Doncaster Works 01/05/1943 29/05/1943 29 days General  
Doncaster Works 04/11/1944 11/11/1944 8 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 14/07/1945 14/07/1945 1 day No repairs  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also

prev prev