Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 224 Today
» 839 Yesterday
» 224 Week
» 18545 Month
» 106737 Year
» 991118 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GNR 1410   08/1905
LNER (1924) 4410   24/05/1924
LNER (1946) 2840   21/09/1946

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Ivatt
Class C1
Company History GNR/LNER
Wheels 4-4-2
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 241
Works Number 1086
To Service During 08/1905
Withdrawal Tue 29/04/1947
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Service Life 41 yrs, 8 mths , 29 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
KX Kings Cross 26/04/1945
   Withdrawn 29/04/1947

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN KX Kings Cross 29/04/1947

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 1914 03/1914   General
Boiler number 6777 (Diagram 1)
 
Doncaster Works 1917 07/1917   General
Superheated boiler fitted
Boiler number 1586 (Diagram 1)
 
Doncaster Works 28/10/1921 15/04/1922 170 days General  
Doncaster Works 04/02/1924 24/05/1924 111 days General
Boiler number 7723 (Diagram 1)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4410
 
Doncaster Works 07/06/1926 04/09/1926 90 days General  
Doncaster Works 17/01/1928 05/04/1928 80 days General  
Doncaster Works 07/12/1929 18/01/1930 43 days General  
Doncaster Works 31/10/1931 12/12/1931 43 days General
Boiler number 7725 (Diagram 1)
 
Doncaster Works 25/11/1933 06/01/1934 43 days General  
Doncaster Works 18/08/1934 29/09/1934 43 days General  
Doncaster Works 25/04/1936 06/06/1936 43 days General  
Doncaster Works 23/04/1938 14/05/1938 22 days General  
Doncaster Works 04/05/1940 15/06/1940 43 days General  
Doncaster Works 29/08/1942 26/09/1942 29 days General  
Doncaster Works 14/10/1944 04/11/1944 22 days General
Boiler number 8383 (Diagram 1)
 
Doncaster Works 23/02/1947 23/02/1947 1 day No repairs  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also

prev prev