03/1906 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1412 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1110 |
|
|
1913 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1913. Dep: ?/12/1913. |
|
|
1916 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1916. Dep: ?/06/1916. Work undertaken: Superheated boiler fitted
|
|
|
23/05/1922 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/05/1922. Dep: 09/09/1922. |
|
|
21/05/1924 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/05/1924. Dep: 02/08/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4412
|
|
|
27/04/1925 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF) |
|
|
06/03/1926 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/03/1926. Dep: 03/07/1926. |
|
|
16/10/1928 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/10/1928. Dep: 07/12/1928. |
|
|
01/03/1930 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/03/1930. Dep: 12/04/1930. |
|
|
30/05/1931 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/05/1931. Dep: 04/07/1931. |
|
|
03/12/1932 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/12/1932. Dep: 07/01/1933. |
|
|
03/11/1934 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/11/1934. Dep: 01/12/1934. |
|
|
14/03/1935 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/03/1935. Dep: 18/04/1936. |
|
|
21/08/1937 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/08/1937. Dep: 02/10/1937. |
|
|
28/01/1939 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/01/1939. Dep: 11/03/1939. |
|
|
27/07/1940 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/07/1940. Dep: 31/08/1940. |
|
|
06/06/1942 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/06/1942. Dep: 16/07/1942. |
|
|
11/04/1943 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF) |
|
|
08/07/1944 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/07/1944. Dep: 05/08/1944. |
|
|
28/07/1946 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) |
|
|
06/10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2842 |
|
|
23/02/1947 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (No repairs) - Arr: 23/02/1947. Dep: 23/02/1947. |
|
|
20/05/1947 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2842 |
|
|