Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 64 Today
» 839 Yesterday
» 64 Week
» 18385 Month
» 106577 Year
» 990958 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GNR 1413   03/1906
LNER (1924 Tmp) 1413N   08/09/1923
LNER (1924) 4413   15/08/1925
LNER (1946) 2843   Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Ivatt
Class C1
Company History GNR/LNER
Wheels 4-4-2
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 245
Works Number 1111
To Service During 03/1906
Withdrawal Fri 04/01/1946
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Service Life 39 yrs, 10 mths , 6 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GRA Grantham 17/08/1933
NWE New England 08/09/1933
   Withdrawn 04/01/1946

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN NWE New England 04/01/1946

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 1913 12/1913   General
Boiler number 7045 (Diagram 1)
 
Doncaster Works 08/07/1920 25/09/1920 80 days General  
Doncaster Works 22/01/1923 08/09/1923 230 days General
Superheated boiler fitted
Boiler number 1676 (Diagram 1)
Renumbered to LNER (1924 Tmp) number 1413N
 
Doncaster Works 14/05/1925 15/08/1925 94 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4413
 
Doncaster Works 06/05/1927 04/10/1927 152 days General  
Doncaster Works 15/06/1929 27/07/1929 43 days General
Boiler number 8235 (Diagram 1)
 
Doncaster Works 27/06/1931 22/08/1931 57 days General  
Doncaster Works 01/04/1933 13/05/1933 43 days General  
Doncaster Works 19/01/1935 23/02/1935 36 days General
Boiler number 8035 (Diagram 1)
 
Doncaster Works 21/12/1935 01/02/1936 43 days General  
Doncaster Works 30/10/1937 27/11/1937 29 days General  
Doncaster Works 06/01/1940 24/02/1940 50 days General  
Doncaster Works 16/05/1942 20/06/1942 36 days General  
Doncaster Works 18/03/1944 08/04/1944 22 days General  
Doncaster Works 24/03/1945 21/04/1945 29 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 15/12/1945 15/12/1945 1 day No repairs  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also

prev prev