Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 205 Today
» 1116 Yesterday
» 205 Week
» 14462 Month
» 242346 Year
» 1463911 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GNR 1414   03/1906
LNER (1924 Tmp) 1414N   22/09/1923
LNER (1924) 4414   20/12/1924
LNER (1946) 2844   Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class C1
Company History GNR/LNER
Wheels 4-4-2
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 245
Works Number 1112
To Service During 03/1906
Withdrawal Sat 28/10/1944
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Service Life 38 yrs, 7 mths , 29 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 03/1906
NWE New England 30/11/1938
CLK Colwick 21/03/1942
   Withdrawn 28/10/1944

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
15/10/1938 WPU Gear removed


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
16/01/1943 Doncaster Notes (engines lettered 'NE') No. 2005, converted to Class 'A,' was due out 16/1. Another 'Q.4' 5048 is on hand for conversion to 'Q.1.' Other arrivals for works are 3838, 3465 an 4993. Streamlined 'B.17' 2870 has left works after a 'general,' also 'J.55' 3859 (BFD). Following on the previous list of engines lettered 'NE' at Plant:- October: 2957, 4474, 1125, 4513, 180, 4003, 4663, 4340, 3488, 4266, 2572, 4655, 3497, 1158, 1367, 4471, 1312, 4312, 3350, 4601, 1141, 4377, 2598, 4490, 2859, 2555, 2461, 483, 3076, 4637, 590, 2766, 4834, 4664, 1118, 4888, 2394, 3224, 4594, 4462, November: 3476, 2439, 4871, 4594, 4646, 4008, 2960, 601, 4053, 4805, 2426, 118, 135, 2563, 112, 1300, 4035, 4449, 4246, 4884, 2744, 4843, 3298, 2417, 5961, 178, 4495, 608, 2958, 2579, 2453, 3050, 125, 114, 4853, 3500, 3494, 2593, 3167. December: 3821, 4497, 4414, 4426, 3276, 4824, 586, 4545, 3621, 4018, 4225, 587, 3275 4793, 2546, 4456, 3819, 4851, 4316, 3631, 3819, 599, 3010, 3593, 17, 3387, 6139, 3498, 1156, 2870, 4240, 2955, 3232, 3047. SLS/194302

Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 1909 10/1909   General  
Doncaster Works 1913 10/1913   General  
Doncaster Works 1918 06/1918   General
Superheated boiler fitted
 
Doncaster Works 25/01/1922 13/05/1922 109 days General  
Doncaster Works 14/04/1923 22/09/1923 162 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924 Tmp) number 1414N
 
Doncaster Works 10/10/1923 13/10/1923 4 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 04/04/1924 29/04/1924 26 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 16/09/1924 20/12/1924 96 days Heavy
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4414
 
Doncaster Works 04/01/1926 20/04/1926 107 days General  
Doncaster Works 25/01/1928 03/05/1928 100 days General  
Doncaster Works 12/10/1929 09/11/1929 29 days General  
Doncaster Works 05/12/1931 13/02/1932 71 days General  
Doncaster Works 27/02/1932 05/03/1932 8 days Light Repair
Steam operated Water Pick-up gear installed
 
Doncaster Works 28/04/1934 09/06/1934 43 days General  
Doncaster Works 11/07/1936 15/08/1936 36 days General  
Doncaster Works 17/04/1937 01/05/1937 15 days General  
Doncaster Works 08/10/1938 15/10/1938 8 days Light Repair
WPU Gear removed
 
Doncaster Works 07/10/1939 18/11/1939 43 days General  
Doncaster Works 31/10/1942 05/12/1942 36 days General  
Doncaster Works 07/10/1944 07/10/1944 1 day No repairs  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1906 To Service To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1414
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1112
   
1909 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 00/00/1909. Dep: 00/10/1909.    
1913 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 00/00/1913. Dep: 00/10/1913.    
1918 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 00/00/1918. Dep: 00/06/1918.
Work undertaken:
Superheated boiler fitted
   
25/01/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/01/1922. Dep: 13/05/1922.    
14/04/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/04/1923. Dep: 22/09/1923.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924 Tmp) number 1414N
   
10/10/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/10/1923. Dep: 13/10/1923.    
04/04/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/04/1924. Dep: 29/04/1924.    
16/09/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 16/09/1924. Dep: 20/12/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4414
   
04/01/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/01/1926. Dep: 20/04/1926.    
25/01/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/01/1928. Dep: 03/05/1928.    
12/10/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/10/1929. Dep: 09/11/1929.    
05/12/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/12/1931. Dep: 13/02/1932.    
27/02/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/02/1932. Dep: 05/03/1932.
Work undertaken:
Steam operated Water Pick-up gear installed
   
28/04/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/04/1934. Dep: 09/06/1934.    
11/07/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/07/1936. Dep: 15/08/1936.    
17/04/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/04/1937. Dep: 01/05/1937.    
08/10/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/10/1938. Dep: 15/10/1938.
Work undertaken:
WPU Gear removed
   
30/11/1938 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
07/10/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/10/1939. Dep: 18/11/1939.    
21/03/1942 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
31/10/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/10/1942. Dep: 05/12/1942.    
07/10/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (No repairs) - Arr: 07/10/1944. Dep: 07/10/1944.    
28/10/1944 Withdrawn Condemned as 4414    
1946 Number Allocated Allocated number 2844 but not taken up    

prev prev