|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 1909 | 11/1909 | General | ||||
Doncaster Works | 1915 | 01/1915 | General | Superheated boiler fitted |
|||
Doncaster Works | 09/05/1922 | 15/07/1922 | 68 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/01/1923 | 24/02/1923 | 27 days | Heavy | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/10/1923 | 24/11/1923 | 53 days | Heavy | Renumbered to LNER (1924 Tmp) number 1416N |
||
Doncaster Works | 02/07/1924 | 24/01/1925 | 207 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4416 |
||
Doncaster Works | 18/02/1926 | 13/03/1926 | 24 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/05/1926 | 03/07/1926 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/04/1927 | 20/05/1927 | 46 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 15/11/1928 | 12/01/1929 | 59 days | General | Smokebox door to Dwg 1366N |
||
Doncaster Works | 11/10/1930 | 29/11/1930 | 50 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/12/1931 | 23/01/1932 | 50 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/05/1934 | 23/06/1934 | 50 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/02/1936 | 11/04/1936 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 15/01/1938 | 12/02/1938 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/04/1939 | 24/06/1939 | 57 days | General | Tail rods removed |
||
Doncaster Works | 02/08/1941 | 13/09/1941 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 14/08/1943 | 25/09/1943 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/10/1945 | 06/10/1945 | 1 day | No repairs |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/1906 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1416 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1114 |
||
1909 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1909. Dep: ?/11/1909. | ||
1915 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1915. Dep: ?/01/1915. Work undertaken: Superheated boiler fitted |
||
09/05/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/05/1922. Dep: 15/07/1922. | ||
29/01/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 29/01/1923. Dep: 24/02/1923. | ||
03/10/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 03/10/1923. Dep: 24/11/1923. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924 Tmp) number 1416N |
||
03/02/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
02/07/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/07/1924. Dep: 24/01/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4416 |
||
18/02/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/02/1926. Dep: 13/03/1926. | ||
22/05/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/05/1926. Dep: 03/07/1926. | ||
05/04/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/04/1927. Dep: 20/05/1927. | ||
15/11/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/11/1928. Dep: 12/01/1929. Work undertaken: Smokebox door to Dwg 1366N |
||
11/10/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/10/1930. Dep: 29/11/1930. | ||
05/12/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/12/1931. Dep: 23/01/1932. | ||
05/05/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/05/1934. Dep: 23/06/1934. | ||
29/02/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/02/1936. Dep: 11/04/1936. | ||
15/01/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/01/1938. Dep: 12/02/1938. | ||
26/04/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cambridge (CAM) | ||
29/04/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/04/1939. Dep: 24/06/1939. Work undertaken: Tail rods removed |
||
21/09/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
02/08/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/08/1941. Dep: 13/09/1941. | ||
14/08/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/08/1943. Dep: 25/09/1943. | ||
06/10/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (No repairs) - Arr: 06/10/1945. Dep: 06/10/1945. | ||
20/10/1945 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 4416 | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 2846 but not taken up |