04/1906 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1417 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1115 |
|
|
1910 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1910. Dep: ?/08/1910. |
|
|
1915 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1915. Dep: ?/07/1915. |
|
|
1917 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1917. Dep: ?/05/1917. Work undertaken: Superheated boiler fitted
|
|
|
08/06/1922 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/06/1922. Dep: 26/08/1922. |
|
|
03/03/1924 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/03/1924. Dep: 14/06/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4417
|
|
|
29/10/1924 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/10/1924. Dep: 04/12/1924. |
|
|
05/02/1925 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/02/1925. Dep: 03/04/1925. |
|
|
03/1925 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (NWE) |
|
|
10/01/1927 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/01/1927. Dep: 16/04/1927. |
|
|
19/01/1929 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/01/1929. Dep: 16/03/1929. |
|
|
06/06/1931 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/06/1931. Dep: 18/07/1931. |
|
|
02/09/1933 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/09/1933. Dep: 04/11/1933. |
|
|
15/06/1935 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/06/1935. Dep: 20/07/1935. |
|
|
06/02/1937 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/02/1937. Dep: 13/03/1937. |
|
|
11/03/1939 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/03/1939. Dep: 06/05/1939. |
|
|
07/06/1941 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/06/1941. Dep: 12/07/1941. |
|
|
13/07/1941 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/07/1941. Dep: 19/07/1941. |
|
|
12/06/1943 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/06/1943. Dep: 17/07/1943. |
|
|
24/03/1945 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (No repairs) - Arr: 24/03/1945. Dep: 24/03/1945. |
|
|
21/04/1945 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 4417 |
|
|
1946 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 2847 but not taken up |
|
|