|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 1911 | 08/1911 | General | ||||
Doncaster Works | 1916 | 01/1916 | General | ||||
Doncaster Works | 26/01/1920 | 10/04/1920 | 76 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/04/1923 | 18/07/1923 | 106 days | General | Superheated boiler fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 30/07/1923 | 15/08/1923 | 17 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/02/1924 | 05/03/1924 | 24 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/03/1924 | 03/05/1924 | 57 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4419 |
||
Darlington Works | 13/05/1924 | 21/07/1924 | 70 days | Light Repair | Raven ESA fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 06/02/1925 | 18/08/1925 | 194 days | Heavy | |||
Darlington Works | 04/09/1925 | 27/10/1925 | 54 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 13/11/1925 | 05/12/1925 | 23 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 21/12/1925 | 05/01/1926 | 16 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 13/01/1926 | 01/02/1926 | 20 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/08/1926 | 27/08/1926 | 9 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/10/1926 | 20/11/1926 | 40 days | Heavy | |||
Darlington Works | 24/11/1926 | 26/01/1927 | 64 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/05/1927 | 15/05/1927 | 12 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 25/11/1927 | 06/03/1928 | 103 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/06/1928 | 29/06/1928 | 29 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/07/1928 | 08/09/1928 | 50 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 15/10/1928 | 05/11/1928 | 22 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 21/11/1928 | 06/12/1928 | 16 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/10/1929 | 21/12/1929 | 82 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 18/08/1930 | 13/11/1930 | 88 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 23/01/1932 | 02/04/1932 | 71 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/08/1932 | 05/11/1932 | 71 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/10/1935 | 16/11/1935 | 36 days | General | Booster removed |
||
Doncaster Works | 28/05/1938 | 16/07/1938 | 50 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/04/1941 | 24/05/1941 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/11/1943 | 04/12/1943 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/07/1946 | 18/01/1947 | 192 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 2849 |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/01/1947 | Kings Cross MPD | No. 2849 (formerly 4419 with booster) is back at K.X. repainted black. | SLS/194704 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/1906 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1419 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1117 |
||
1911 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1911. Dep: ?/08/1911. | ||
1916 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1916. Dep: ?/01/1916. | ||
26/01/1920 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/01/1920. Dep: 10/04/1920. | ||
04/04/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/04/1923. Dep: 18/07/1923. Work undertaken: Superheated boiler fitted |
||
30/07/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/07/1923. Dep: 15/08/1923. | ||
11/02/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/02/1924. Dep: 05/03/1924. | ||
08/03/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/03/1924. Dep: 03/05/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4419 |
||
03/05/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
13/05/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/05/1924. Dep: 21/07/1924. Work undertaken: Raven ESA fitted |
||
06/02/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 06/02/1925. Dep: 18/08/1925. | ||
04/09/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/09/1925. Dep: 27/10/1925. | ||
27/10/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD) | ||
13/11/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/11/1925. Dep: 05/12/1925. | ||
05/12/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
21/12/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/12/1925. Dep: 05/01/1926. | ||
13/01/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/01/1926. Dep: 01/02/1926. | ||
01/02/1926 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
18/02/1926 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP) | ||
19/08/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/08/1926. Dep: 27/08/1926. | ||
12/10/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 12/10/1926. Dep: 20/11/1926. | ||
24/11/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/11/1926. Dep: 26/01/1927. | ||
16/02/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (STM) | ||
01/03/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP) | ||
04/03/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
04/05/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/05/1927. Dep: 15/05/1927. | ||
02/07/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
25/11/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/11/1927. Dep: 06/03/1928. | ||
10/03/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
01/06/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 01/06/1928. Dep: 29/06/1928. | ||
21/07/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/07/1928. Dep: 08/09/1928. | ||
04/08/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
29/09/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
15/10/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/10/1928. Dep: 05/11/1928. | ||
21/11/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/11/1928. Dep: 06/12/1928. | ||
29/04/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
01/10/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/10/1929. Dep: 21/12/1929. | ||
18/08/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/08/1930. Dep: 13/11/1930. | ||
23/01/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/01/1932. Dep: 02/04/1932. | ||
27/08/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/08/1932. Dep: 05/11/1932. | ||
12/10/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/10/1935. Dep: 16/11/1935. Work undertaken: Booster removed |
||
07/01/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hitchin (GNR) (HIT ) | ||
28/05/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/05/1938. Dep: 16/07/1938. | ||
12/04/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/04/1941. Dep: 24/05/1941. | ||
06/11/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/11/1943. Dep: 04/12/1943. | ||
11/07/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/07/1946. Dep: 18/01/1947. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 2849 |
||
18/01/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
1948 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 62849 but not taken up | ||
19/07/1948 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 2849 |