Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 131 Today
» 869 Yesterday
» 131 Week
» 18253 Month
» 187025 Year
» 1071406 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GNR 1422   03/1907
LNER (1924) 4422   18/10/1924
LNER (1946) 2852   Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class C1
Company History GNR/LNER
Wheels 4-4-2
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 249
Works Number 1144
To Service During 03/1907
Withdrawal Sat 28/09/1946
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Service Life 39 yrs, 6 mths , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
KX Kings Cross 28/04/1945
   Withdrawn 28/09/1946

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 1912 03/1912   General
Boiler number 7043 (Diagram 1)
 
Doncaster Works 1916 11/1916   General
Boiler number 6776 (Diagram 1)
 
Doncaster Works 1919 06/1919   General
Superheated boiler fitted
Boiler number 1578 (Diagram 1)
 
Doncaster Works 06/05/1922 08/07/1922 64 days General  
Doncaster Works 03/06/1924 18/10/1924 138 days General
Boiler number 6862 (Diagram 1)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4422
 
Doncaster Works 07/04/1926 27/08/1926 143 days General  
Doncaster Works 04/05/1927 19/08/1927 108 days General  
Doncaster Works 20/09/1928 24/11/1928 66 days General
Boiler number 6860 (Diagram 1)
 
Doncaster Works 01/11/1930 13/12/1930 43 days General
Boiler number 7729 (Diagram 1)
 
Doncaster Works 31/12/1931 20/02/1932 52 days General  
Doncaster Works 18/06/1932 25/06/1932 8 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 10/02/1934 17/03/1934 36 days General  
Doncaster Works 16/05/1936 27/06/1936 43 days General
Boiler number 7730 (Diagram 1)
 
Doncaster Works 13/11/1937 11/12/1937 29 days General  
Doncaster Works 09/12/1939 27/01/1940 50 days General  
Doncaster Works 31/01/1942 14/03/1942 43 days General  
Doncaster Works 01/03/1944 01/04/1944 32 days General  
Doncaster Works 07/09/1946 07/09/1946 1 day No repairs  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also

prev prev