|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 1911 | 03/1911 | General | ||||
Doncaster Works | 1916 | 01/1916 | General | ||||
Doncaster Works | 02/11/1921 | 01/04/1922 | 151 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/12/1923 | 10/04/1924 | 124 days | General | Superheated boiler fitted Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4424 |
||
Doncaster Works | 22/09/1926 | 15/01/1927 | 116 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 26/10/1929 | 07/12/1929 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/02/1933 | 11/03/1933 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/07/1935 | 07/09/1935 | 64 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/06/1937 | 31/07/1937 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/01/1939 | 04/03/1939 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/05/1941 | 14/06/1941 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/06/1943 | 24/07/1943 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/09/1943 | 09/10/1943 | 36 days | Heavy | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/08/1945 | 15/09/1945 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/09/1946 | 11/01/1947 | 125 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 2854 |
||
Doncaster Works | 22/08/1947 | 07/10/1947 | 47 days | General |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/1907 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1424 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1147 |
||
1911 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1911. Dep: ?/03/1911. | ||
1916 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1916. Dep: ?/01/1916. | ||
02/11/1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/11/1921. Dep: 01/04/1922. | ||
09/12/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/12/1923. Dep: 10/04/1924. Work undertaken: Superheated boiler fitted Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4424 |
||
04/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
22/09/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/09/1926. Dep: 15/01/1927. | ||
26/10/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/10/1929. Dep: 07/12/1929. | ||
04/02/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/02/1933. Dep: 11/03/1933. | ||
06/07/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/07/1935. Dep: 07/09/1935. | ||
01/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
19/06/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/06/1937. Dep: 31/07/1937. | ||
21/01/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/01/1939. Dep: 04/03/1939. | ||
10/05/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/05/1941. Dep: 14/06/1941. | ||
19/06/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/06/1943. Dep: 24/07/1943. | ||
01/07/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
04/09/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 04/09/1943. Dep: 09/10/1943. | ||
11/08/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/08/1945. Dep: 15/09/1945. | ||
09/09/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/09/1946. Dep: 11/01/1947. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 2854 |
||
22/08/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/08/1947. Dep: 07/10/1947. | ||
09/07/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF) | ||
03/04/1950 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 2854 |