|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 1915 | 05/1915 | General | ||||
Doncaster Works | 1919 | 11/1919 | General | Superheated boiler fizted |
|||
Doncaster Works | 06/04/1922 | 24/06/1922 | 80 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/08/1923 | 06/10/1923 | 64 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924 Tmp) number 1427N |
||
Doncaster Works | 28/08/1925 | 28/11/1925 | 93 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4427 |
||
Doncaster Works | 22/02/1928 | 18/05/1928 | 87 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/04/1930 | 17/05/1930 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/03/1933 | 22/04/1933 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 02/12/1933 | 16/12/1933 | 15 days | Light Repair | Heating connection fitted to front end |
||
Doncaster Works | 30/11/1935 | 18/01/1936 | 50 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/05/1938 | 18/06/1938 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/04/1942 | 16/05/1942 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/01/1945 | 27/01/1945 | 1 day | No repairs |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/1907 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1427 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1149 |
||
1915 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1915. Dep: ?/05/1915. | ||
1919 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1919. Dep: ?/11/1919. Work undertaken: Superheated boiler fizted |
||
06/04/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/04/1922. Dep: 24/06/1922. | ||
04/08/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/08/1923. Dep: 06/10/1923. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924 Tmp) number 1427N |
||
28/08/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/08/1925. Dep: 28/11/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4427 |
||
22/02/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/02/1928. Dep: 18/05/1928. | ||
14/06/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hitchin (GNR) (HIT ) | ||
05/04/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/04/1930. Dep: 17/05/1930. | ||
18/03/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/03/1933. Dep: 22/04/1933. | ||
02/12/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/12/1933. Dep: 16/12/1933. Work undertaken: Heating connection fitted to front end |
||
30/11/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/11/1935. Dep: 18/01/1936. | ||
21/05/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/05/1938. Dep: 18/06/1938. | ||
17/02/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
11/05/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN) | ||
04/04/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/04/1942. Dep: 16/05/1942. | ||
27/01/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (No repairs) - Arr: 27/01/1945. Dep: 27/01/1945. | ||
20/02/1945 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 4427 | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 2857 but not taken up |