|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 1913 | 06/1913 | General | Superheated boiler fitted |
|||
Doncaster Works | 1922 | 02/1922 | General | ||||
Doncaster Works | 09/01/1923 | 17/02/1923 | 40 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 15/04/1924 | 14/06/1924 | 61 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4428 |
||
Doncaster Works | 24/03/1926 | 03/08/1926 | 133 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 30/04/1928 | 27/07/1928 | 89 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/01/1930 | 22/02/1930 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/12/1931 | 30/01/1932 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/07/1933 | 19/08/1933 | 50 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/11/1934 | 22/12/1934 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/04/1936 | 23/05/1936 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/09/1937 | 23/10/1937 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/09/1940 | 02/11/1940 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/04/1942 | 30/05/1942 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/03/1943 | 10/04/1943 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/04/1944 | 06/05/1944 | 29 days | General | After collision |
||
Doncaster Works | 11/05/1946 | 11/05/1946 | 1 day | No repairs |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/1907 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1428 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1150 |
||
1913 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1913. Dep: ?/06/1913. Work undertaken: Superheated boiler fitted |
||
1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1922. Dep: ?/02/1922. | ||
09/01/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/01/1923. Dep: 17/02/1923. | ||
06/05/1923 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
23/12/1923 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF) | ||
15/04/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/04/1924. Dep: 14/06/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4428 |
||
24/03/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/03/1926. Dep: 03/08/1926. | ||
30/04/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/04/1928. Dep: 27/07/1928. | ||
18/01/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/01/1930. Dep: 22/02/1930. | ||
19/12/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/12/1931. Dep: 30/01/1932. | ||
01/07/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/07/1933. Dep: 19/08/1933. | ||
10/11/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/11/1934. Dep: 22/12/1934. | ||
11/04/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/04/1936. Dep: 23/05/1936. | ||
25/09/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/09/1937. Dep: 23/10/1937. | ||
08/08/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP) | ||
21/09/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/09/1940. Dep: 02/11/1940. | ||
04/11/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
15/10/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
18/04/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/04/1942. Dep: 30/05/1942. | ||
27/03/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/03/1943. Dep: 10/04/1943. | ||
08/04/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/04/1944. Dep: 06/05/1944. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 2858 but not taken up | ||
11/05/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (No repairs) - Arr: 11/05/1946. Dep: 11/05/1946. | ||
15/06/1946 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 4428 |