Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 275 Today
» 960 Yesterday
» 2182 Week
» 20964 Month
» 269257 Year
» 1153638 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GNR 1430   06/1907
LNER (1924 Tmp) 1430N   18/08/1923
LNER (1924) 4430   15/11/1924
LNER (1946) 2860   Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class C1
Company History GNR/LNER
Wheels 4-4-2
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 249
Works Number 1153
To Service During 06/1907
Withdrawal Thu 03/02/1944
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Service Life 36 yrs, 8 mths , 3 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
CAM Cambridge 22/11/1928
GRA Grantham 25/06/1939
   Withdrawn 03/02/1944

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 1913 07/1913   General
Superheated boiler fitted
Boiler number 7022 (Diagram 1)
 
Doncaster Works 03/05/1921 24/09/1921 145 days General
Boiler number 7026 (Diagram 1)
 
Doncaster Works 23/02/1922 08/04/1922 45 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 22/06/1923 18/08/1923 58 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924 Tmp) number 1430N
 
Doncaster Works 07/12/1923 26/01/1924 51 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 06/08/1924 15/11/1924 102 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4430
 
Doncaster Works 06/07/1925 17/10/1925 104 days General  
Doncaster Works 11/10/1926 07/01/1927 89 days General
Boiler number 7042 (Diagram 1)
 
Doncaster Works 15/09/1928 17/11/1928 64 days General  
Doncaster Works 23/08/1930 18/10/1930 57 days General
Boiler number 8299 (Diagram 1)
 
Doncaster Works 13/02/1932 19/03/1932 36 days General  
Doncaster Works 18/11/1933 30/12/1933 43 days General  
Doncaster Works 07/02/1934 10/03/1934 32 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 26/10/1935 14/12/1935 50 days General
Boiler number 8286 (Diagram 1)
 
Doncaster Works 24/04/1937 08/05/1937 15 days General
Boiler number 8662 (Diagram 1)
 
Doncaster Works 17/09/1938 15/10/1938 29 days General  
Doncaster Works 17/05/1941 28/06/1941 43 days General  
Doncaster Works 28/03/1942 11/04/1942 15 days Light Repair
After collision
 
Doncaster Works 15/01/1944 15/01/1944 1 day No repairs  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also

prev prev