Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 36 Today
» 834 Yesterday
» 5468 Week
» 17289 Month
» 186061 Year
» 1070442 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GNR 1434   11/1907
LNER (1924) 4434   09/05/1925
LNER (1946) 2864   Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class C1
Company History GNR/LNER
Wheels 4-4-2
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 253
Works Number 1173
To Service During 11/1907
Withdrawal Thu 26/04/1945
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Service Life 37 yrs, 5 mths , 26 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
SHF Sheffield Neepsend m/e 06/1923
HIT Hitchin (GNR) 08/03/1937
KX Kings Cross 02/01/1938
HIT Hitchin (GNR) 07/08/1938
   Withdrawn 26/04/1945

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 1912 11/1912   General
Superheated boiler fitted
Boiler number 7023 (Diagram 1)
 
Doncaster Works 1919 10/1919   General
Boiler number 7049 (Diagram 1)
 
Doncaster Works 11/12/1922 28/03/1923 108 days General  
Doncaster Works 12/05/1924 17/05/1924 6 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 07/01/1925 09/05/1925 123 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4434
 
Doncaster Works 17/12/1926 26/03/1927 100 days General  
Doncaster Works 16/02/1929 13/04/1929 57 days General
Boiler number 6802 (Diagram 1)
 
Doncaster Works 31/12/1930 14/02/1931 46 days General
Boiler number 8385 (Diagram 1)
 
Doncaster Works 14/01/1933 25/02/1933 43 days General  
Doncaster Works 30/09/1933 11/11/1933 43 days General  
Doncaster Works 08/06/1935 20/07/1935 43 days General  
Doncaster Works 14/11/1936 12/12/1936 29 days General  
Doncaster Works 27/11/1937 31/12/1937 35 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 02/12/1939 13/01/1940 43 days General  
Doncaster Works 03/05/1941 28/06/1941 57 days General
Boiler number 8663 (Diagram 1)
 
Doncaster Works 14/04/1944 12/05/1944 29 days General  
Doncaster Works 14/04/1945 14/04/1945 1 day No repairs  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also

prev prev