|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 1911 | 07/1911 | General | ||||
Doncaster Works | 1913 | 10/1913 | General | Superheated boiler fitted |
|||
Doncaster Works | 1920 | 06/1920 | General | ||||
Doncaster Works | 25/10/1921 | 06/05/1922 | 194 days | Heavy | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/04/1923 | 05/05/1923 | 18 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 02/11/1923 | 01/03/1924 | 121 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4435 |
||
Doncaster Works | 15/06/1925 | 03/10/1925 | 111 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/04/1927 | 16/07/1927 | 96 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/10/1929 | 16/11/1929 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 30/05/1931 | 11/07/1931 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 20/05/1933 | 15/07/1933 | 57 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/03/1935 | 13/04/1935 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/04/1937 | 08/05/1937 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/08/1939 | 30/09/1939 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/10/1941 | 29/11/1941 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/03/1942 | 18/04/1942 | 22 days | Light Repair | After collision |
||
Doncaster Works | 13/11/1943 | 04/12/1943 | 22 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/01/1945 | 17/02/1945 | 22 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/12/1945 | 08/12/1945 | 1 day | No repairs |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/1907 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1435 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1174 |
||
1911 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1911. Dep: ?/07/1911. | ||
1913 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1913. Dep: ?/10/1913. Work undertaken: Superheated boiler fitted |
||
1920 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1920. Dep: ?/06/1920. | ||
25/10/1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 25/10/1921. Dep: 06/05/1922. | ||
18/04/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/04/1923. Dep: 05/05/1923. | ||
02/11/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/11/1923. Dep: 01/03/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4435 |
||
15/06/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/06/1925. Dep: 03/10/1925. | ||
12/04/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/04/1927. Dep: 16/07/1927. | ||
12/10/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/10/1929. Dep: 16/11/1929. | ||
30/05/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/05/1931. Dep: 11/07/1931. | ||
20/05/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/05/1933. Dep: 15/07/1933. | ||
09/03/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/03/1935. Dep: 13/04/1935. | ||
10/04/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/04/1937. Dep: 08/05/1937. | ||
19/08/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/08/1939. Dep: 30/09/1939. | ||
25/10/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/10/1941. Dep: 29/11/1941. | ||
28/03/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/03/1942. Dep: 18/04/1942. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
13/11/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/11/1943. Dep: 04/12/1943. | ||
27/01/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/01/1945. Dep: 17/02/1945. | ||
08/12/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (No repairs) - Arr: 08/12/1945. Dep: 08/12/1945. | ||
20/12/1945 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 4435 | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 2865 but not taken up |