Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 2990 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16396 Week
» 69412 Month
» 188939 Year
» 3215792 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
1438 |
|
03/1908 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
4438 |
|
11/10/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2868 |
|
26/01/1946 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
C1 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
4-4-2 |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
253 |
Works Number |
1187 |
To Service |
During 03/1908 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 08/08/1947 |
Service Life |
39 yrs, 5 mths , 10 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
03/1908 |
GRA |
|
Grantham |
on |
23/06/1923 |
KX |
|
Kings Cross |
on |
23/03/1944 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
08/08/1947 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
KX |
Kings Cross |
on |
08/08/1947 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1908 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1438 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1187 |
|
|
1916 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1916. Dep: ?/06/1916. |
|
|
06/04/1922 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/04/1922. Dep: 15/07/1922. |
|
|
21/03/1923 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 21/03/1923. Dep: 23/06/1923. Work undertaken: Superheated boiler fitted
|
|
|
23/06/1923 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) |
|
|
11/07/1924 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/07/1924. Dep: 11/10/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4438
|
|
|
12/06/1926 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/06/1926. Dep: 27/10/1926. |
|
|
21/04/1928 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/04/1928. Dep: 12/07/1928. |
|
|
29/03/1930 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/03/1930. Dep: 17/05/1930. |
|
|
06/05/1933 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/05/1933. Dep: 17/06/1933. |
|
|
30/03/1935 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/03/1935. Dep: 04/05/1935. |
|
|
17/04/1937 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/04/1937. Dep: 15/05/1937. |
|
|
26/08/1939 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/08/1939. Dep: 28/10/1939. |
|
|
04/01/1941 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/01/1941. Dep: 25/01/1941. |
|
|
03/04/1943 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/04/1943. Dep: 15/05/1943. |
|
|
23/03/1944 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) |
|
|
18/11/1944 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/11/1944. Dep: 23/12/1944. |
|
|
15/12/1945 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/12/1945. Dep: 05/01/1946. |
|
|
26/01/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2868 |
|
|
08/08/1947 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2868 |
|
|