Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 1089 Today
» 1293 Yesterday
» 7296 Week
» 4809 Month
» 232693 Year
» 1454258 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GNR 1439   03/1908
LNER (1924) 4439   17/05/1924
LNER (1946) 2869   03/03/1946

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class C1
Company History GNR/LNER
Wheels 4-4-2
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 253
Works Number 1188
To Service During 03/1908
Withdrawal Thu 02/01/1947
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Service Life 38 yrs, 10 mths , 4 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 03/1908
GRA Grantham 23/06/1923
CAM Cambridge 19/07/1933
NWE New England 29/09/1939
   Withdrawn 02/01/1947

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 1916 09/1916   General
Superheated boiler fitted
 
Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow 05/05/1921 01/11/1921 181 days General  
Doncaster Works 21/02/1923 05/05/1923 74 days Heavy  
Doncaster Works 05/04/1924 17/05/1924 43 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4439
 
Doncaster Works 29/10/1924 21/02/1925 116 days Heavy  
Doncaster Works 14/12/1925 20/03/1926 97 days General  
Doncaster Works 25/01/1927 09/07/1927 166 days General  
Doncaster Works 25/05/1929 29/06/1929 36 days General  
Doncaster Works 30/05/1931 04/07/1931 36 days General  
Doncaster Works 03/06/1933 22/07/1933 50 days General  
Doncaster Works 30/06/1934 18/08/1934 50 days General  
Doncaster Works 11/01/1936 22/02/1936 43 days General  
Doncaster Works 24/07/1937 28/08/1937 36 days General  
Doncaster Works 18/03/1939 29/04/1939 43 days General  
Doncaster Works 10/05/1941 28/06/1941 50 days General  
Doncaster Works 15/08/1942 26/09/1942 43 days General  
Doncaster Works 14/10/1944 11/11/1944 29 days General  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1908 To Service To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1439
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1188
   
1916 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 00/00/1916. Dep: 00/09/1916.
Work undertaken:
Superheated boiler fitted
   
05/05/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow (General) - Arr: 05/05/1921. Dep: 01/11/1921.    
21/02/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 21/02/1923. Dep: 05/05/1923.    
23/06/1923 Allocation Reallocated to Grantham (GRA)    
05/04/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/04/1924. Dep: 17/05/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4439
   
29/10/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 29/10/1924. Dep: 21/02/1925.    
14/12/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/12/1925. Dep: 20/03/1926.    
25/01/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/01/1927. Dep: 09/07/1927.    
25/05/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/05/1929. Dep: 29/06/1929.    
30/05/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/05/1931. Dep: 04/07/1931.    
03/06/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/06/1933. Dep: 22/07/1933.    
19/07/1933 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (CAM)    
30/06/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/06/1934. Dep: 18/08/1934.    
11/01/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/01/1936. Dep: 22/02/1936.    
24/07/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/07/1937. Dep: 28/08/1937.    
18/03/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/03/1939. Dep: 29/04/1939.    
29/09/1939 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
10/05/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/05/1941. Dep: 28/06/1941.    
15/08/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/08/1942. Dep: 26/09/1942.    
14/10/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/10/1944. Dep: 11/11/1944.    
03/03/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 2869    
02/01/1947 Withdrawn Condemned as 2869    

prev prev