Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 190 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 190 Week
» 18972 Month
» 267265 Year
» 1151646 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GNR 1439   03/1908
LNER (1924) 4439   17/05/1924
LNER (1946) 2869   03/03/1946

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class C1
Company History GNR/LNER
Wheels 4-4-2
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 253
Works Number 1188
To Service During 03/1908
Withdrawal Thu 02/01/1947
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Service Life 38 yrs, 10 mths , 4 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GRA Grantham 23/06/1923
CAM Cambridge 19/07/1933
NWE New England 29/09/1939
   Withdrawn 02/01/1947

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 1916 09/1916   General
Superheated boiler fitted
Boiler number 6827 (Diagram 1)
 
Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow 05/05/1921 01/11/1921 181 days General  
Doncaster Works 21/02/1923 05/05/1923 74 days Heavy  
Doncaster Works 05/04/1924 17/05/1924 43 days General
Boiler number 6892 (Diagram 1)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4439
 
Doncaster Works 29/10/1924 21/02/1925 116 days Heavy  
Doncaster Works 14/12/1925 20/03/1926 97 days General  
Doncaster Works 25/01/1927 09/07/1927 166 days General  
Doncaster Works 25/05/1929 29/06/1929 36 days General
Boiler number 8232 (Diagram 1)
 
Doncaster Works 30/05/1931 04/07/1931 36 days General  
Doncaster Works 03/06/1933 22/07/1933 50 days General  
Doncaster Works 30/06/1934 18/08/1934 50 days General  
Doncaster Works 11/01/1936 22/02/1936 43 days General
Boiler number 7972 (Diagram 1)
 
Doncaster Works 24/07/1937 28/08/1937 36 days General  
Doncaster Works 18/03/1939 29/04/1939 43 days General  
Doncaster Works 10/05/1941 28/06/1941 50 days General  
Doncaster Works 15/08/1942 26/09/1942 43 days General  
Doncaster Works 14/10/1944 11/11/1944 29 days General
Boiler number 8289 (Diagram 1)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also

prev prev