Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 190 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 190 Week
» 18972 Month
» 267265 Year
» 1151646 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GNR 1440   03/1908
LNER (1924) 4440   08/11/1924
LNER (1946) 2870   10/03/1946

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class C1
Company History GNR/LNER
Wheels 4-4-2
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 253
Works Number 1189
To Service During 03/1908
Withdrawal Sat 14/02/1948
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Service Life 39 yrs, 11 mths , 16 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
CAM Cambridge 29/10/1934
KX Kings Cross 07/11/1934
CAM Cambridge 04/01/1935
KX Kings Cross 05/10/1938
LIN Lincoln 11/05/1941
DON Doncaster 14/10/1941
KX Kings Cross 25/06/1944
NWE New England w/e 22/01/1947
   Withdrawn 14/02/1948

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC NWE New England 22/01/1947
ALLOC BOS Boston 30/03/1947
ALLOC GRA Grantham 04/05/1947
WDN GRA Grantham 14/02/1948

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 1915 06/1915   General
Boiler number 6888 (Diagram 1)
 
Doncaster Works 25/03/1920 10/07/1920 108 days General
Superheated boiler fitted
Boiler number 6897 (Diagram 1)
 
Doncaster Works 20/02/1923 09/06/1923 110 days General  
Doncaster Works 03/03/1924 12/04/1924 41 days General  
Doncaster Works 28/07/1924 08/11/1924 104 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4440
 
Doncaster Works 01/07/1926 09/11/1926 132 days General
Boiler number 7864 (Diagram 1)
 
Doncaster Works 28/07/1928 11/10/1928 76 days General  
Doncaster Works 21/06/1930 02/08/1930 43 days General  
Doncaster Works 10/12/1932 21/01/1933 43 days General  
Doncaster Works 17/11/1934 22/12/1934 36 days General
Boiler number 8041 (Diagram 1)
 
Doncaster Works 26/10/1935 30/11/1935 36 days General  
Doncaster Works 24/10/1936 28/11/1936 36 days General  
Doncaster Works 18/09/1937 09/10/1937 22 days General
Boiler number 8038 (Diagram 1)
 
Doncaster Works 13/08/1938 20/08/1938 8 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 16/12/1939 17/02/1940 64 days General  
Doncaster Works 09/01/1943 13/02/1943 36 days General  
Doncaster Works 04/11/1944 09/12/1944 36 days General  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also

prev prev