Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 36 Today
» 1367 Yesterday
» 6570 Week
» 6570 Month
» 195705 Year
» 1417270 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GNR 1441   03/1908
LNER (1924) 4441   18/07/1925
LNER (1946) 2871   17/02/1946

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class C1
Company History GNR/LNER
Wheels 4-4-2
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 253
Works Number 1190
To Service During 03/1908
Withdrawal Fri 21/05/1948
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Service Life 40 yrs, 2 mths , 22 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 03/1908
CAM Cambridge 07/05/1929
KX Kings Cross 29/10/1934
CAM Cambridge 07/11/1934
KX Kings Cross 04/01/1935
DON Doncaster 24/09/1935
KX Kings Cross 25/06/1944
   Withdrawn 21/05/1948

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 1918 06/1918   General
Superheated boiler fitted
 
Doncaster Works 20/01/1923 30/04/1923 101 days General
Hulburd mechanical lubricator fitted
 
Doncaster Works 30/04/1925 18/07/1925 80 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4441
 
Doncaster Works 08/04/1927 18/06/1927 72 days General  
Doncaster Works 16/03/1929 27/04/1929 43 days General  
Doncaster Works 31/12/1930 07/02/1931 39 days General  
Doncaster Works 07/10/1933 18/11/1933 43 days General  
Doncaster Works 13/07/1935 24/08/1935 43 days General  
Doncaster Works 24/04/1937 08/05/1937 15 days General  
Doncaster Works 14/05/1938 04/06/1938 22 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 10/06/1939 22/07/1939 43 days General  
Doncaster Works 09/05/1942 06/06/1942 29 days General  
Doncaster Works 12/12/1942 19/12/1942 8 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 30/09/1944 04/11/1944 36 days General  
Doncaster Works 08/05/1948 08/05/1948 1 day No repairs  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1908 To Service To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1441
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1190
   
1918 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 00/00/1918. Dep: 00/06/1918.
Work undertaken:
Superheated boiler fitted
   
20/01/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/01/1923. Dep: 30/04/1923.
Work undertaken:
Hulburd mechanical lubricator fitted
   
30/04/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/04/1925. Dep: 18/07/1925.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4441
   
08/04/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/04/1927. Dep: 18/06/1927.    
16/03/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/03/1929. Dep: 27/04/1929.    
07/05/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (CAM)    
31/12/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/12/1930. Dep: 07/02/1931.    
07/10/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/10/1933. Dep: 18/11/1933.    
29/10/1934 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX)    
07/11/1934 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (CAM)    
04/01/1935 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX)    
13/07/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/07/1935. Dep: 24/08/1935.    
24/09/1935 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
24/04/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/04/1937. Dep: 08/05/1937.    
14/05/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 14/05/1938. Dep: 04/06/1938.    
10/06/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/06/1939. Dep: 22/07/1939.    
09/05/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/05/1942. Dep: 06/06/1942.    
12/12/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/12/1942. Dep: 19/12/1942.    
25/06/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX)    
30/09/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/09/1944. Dep: 04/11/1944.    
17/02/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 2871    
08/05/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (No repairs) - Arr: 08/05/1948. Dep: 08/05/1948.    
21/05/1948 Withdrawn Condemned as 2871    

prev prev