Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 1016 Today
» 1075 Yesterday
» 3115 Week
» 14686 Month
» 262979 Year
» 1147360 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GNR 1444   04/1908
LNER (1924) 4444   18/07/1925
LNER (1946) 2874   Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class C1
Company History GNR/LNER
Wheels 4-4-2
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 255
Works Number 1192
To Service During 04/1908
Withdrawal Tue 02/10/1945
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Service Life 37 yrs, 6 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
CAM Cambridge 09/01/1928
KX Kings Cross 12/03/1928
HIT Hitchin (GNR) 27/04/1941
   Withdrawn 02/10/1945

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 1914 08/1914   General
Boiler number 6834 (Diagram 1)
 
Doncaster Works 1917 05/1917   General
Superheated boiler fitted
Boiler number 6862 (Diagram 1)
 
Doncaster Works 08/12/1922 02/04/1923 116 days General
Boiler number 6857 (Diagram 1)
 
Doncaster Works 03/04/1925 18/07/1925 107 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4444
 
Doncaster Works 25/04/1927 13/08/1927 111 days General
Boiler number 7976 (Diagram 1)
 
Doncaster Works 25/05/1929 13/07/1929 50 days General  
Doncaster Works 28/03/1931 02/05/1931 36 days General  
Doncaster Works 17/10/1931 14/11/1931 29 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 28/01/1933 04/03/1933 36 days General
Boiler number 7974 (Diagram 1)
 
Doncaster Works 06/10/1934 03/11/1934 29 days General  
Doncaster Works 10/10/1936 21/11/1936 43 days General  
Doncaster Works 12/08/1939 30/09/1939 50 days General  
Doncaster Works 20/06/1942 25/07/1942 36 days General  
Doncaster Works 23/09/1944 21/10/1944 29 days General
Boiler number 9459 (Diagram 1)
 
Doncaster Works 13/01/1945 27/01/1945 15 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 15/09/1945 15/09/1945 1 day No repairs  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also

prev prev