Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 290 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18093 Week
» 71109 Month
» 190636 Year
» 3217489 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
1448 |
|
07/1908 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924 Tmp) |
1448N |
|
10/11/1923 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
4448 |
|
06/06/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2878 |
|
Not applied |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
C1 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
4-4-2 |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
255 |
Works Number |
1197 |
To Service |
During 07/1908 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 15/06/1946 |
Service Life |
37 yrs, 11 mths , 16 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
07/1908 |
GRA |
|
Grantham |
on |
02/03/1924 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
15/06/1946 |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1908 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1448 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1197 |
|
|
1912 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1912. Dep: ?/01/1912. |
|
|
1919 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1919. Dep: ?/03/1919. Work undertaken: Superheated boiler fitted
|
|
|
06/05/1921 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/05/1921. Dep: 08/11/1921. |
|
|
23/08/1923 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/08/1923. Dep: 10/11/1923. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924 Tmp) number 1448N
|
|
|
12/12/1923 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/12/1923. Dep: 22/12/1923. |
|
|
02/03/1924 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) |
|
|
06/06/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4448 |
|
|
18/11/1925 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/11/1925. Dep: 26/03/1926. |
|
|
24/01/1927 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/01/1927. Dep: 12/03/1927. |
|
|
26/03/1927 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/03/1927. Dep: 09/04/1927. |
|
|
22/08/1928 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/08/1928. Dep: 17/10/1928. |
|
|
06/09/1930 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/09/1930. Dep: 18/10/1930. |
|
|
22/04/1933 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/04/1933. Dep: 03/06/1933. |
|
|
09/02/1935 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/02/1935. Dep: 16/03/1935. |
|
|
19/12/1936 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/12/1936. Dep: 23/01/1937. |
|
|
27/01/1940 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/01/1940. Dep: 09/03/1940. |
|
|
20/06/1942 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/06/1942. Dep: 08/08/1942. |
|
|
24/02/1945 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/02/1945. Dep: 14/04/1945. |
|
|
1946 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 2878 but not taken up |
|
|
25/05/1946 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (No repairs) - Arr: 25/05/1946. Dep: 25/05/1946. |
|
|
15/06/1946 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 4448 |
|
|