|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 1912 | 07/1912 | General | ||||
Doncaster Works | 25/10/1921 | 11/03/1922 | 138 days | General | Superheated boiler fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 04/06/1924 | 30/08/1924 | 88 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4451 |
||
Doncaster Works | 24/03/1926 | 01/09/1926 | 162 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/06/1928 | 16/08/1928 | 74 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/01/1930 | 08/02/1930 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/04/1931 | 06/06/1931 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/12/1932 | 28/01/1933 | 57 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/03/1934 | 14/04/1934 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/09/1934 | 20/10/1934 | 29 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/01/1937 | 27/02/1937 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/04/1940 | 04/05/1940 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/08/1943 | 04/09/1943 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/05/1946 | 15/06/1946 | 36 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 2881 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/1908 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1451 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1201 |
||
1912 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1912. Dep: ?/07/1912. | ||
25/10/1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/10/1921. Dep: 11/03/1922. Work undertaken: Superheated boiler fitted |
||
04/06/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/06/1924. Dep: 30/08/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4451 |
||
24/03/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/03/1926. Dep: 01/09/1926. | ||
14/01/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF) | ||
04/06/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/06/1928. Dep: 16/08/1928. | ||
04/01/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/01/1930. Dep: 08/02/1930. | ||
25/04/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/04/1931. Dep: 06/06/1931. | ||
03/12/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/12/1932. Dep: 28/01/1933. | ||
26/02/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
10/03/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/03/1934. Dep: 14/04/1934. | ||
22/09/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/09/1934. Dep: 20/10/1934. | ||
11/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hitchin (GNR) (HIT ) | ||
29/11/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hitchin (GNR) (HIT ) | ||
16/01/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/01/1937. Dep: 27/02/1937. | ||
06/04/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/04/1940. Dep: 04/05/1940. | ||
07/08/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/08/1943. Dep: 04/09/1943. | ||
11/05/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/05/1946. Dep: 15/06/1946. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 2881 |
||
05/01/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
12/06/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hitchin (GNR) (HIT ) | ||
29/04/1949 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 2881 |