|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 1913 | 03/1913 | General | ||||
Doncaster Works | 16/06/1922 | 24/06/1922 | 9 days | Heavy | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/10/1923 | 12/01/1924 | 86 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924 Tmp) number 1455N |
||
Doncaster Works | 02/12/1925 | 03/03/1926 | 92 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/01/1928 | 22/03/1928 | 67 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 26/11/1928 | 03/12/1928 | 8 days | Unclassified | Flaman speed recorder fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 12/10/1929 | 09/11/1929 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/12/1931 | 03/12/1931 | 1 day | Special | Flaman speed recorder removed |
||
Doncaster Works | 20/02/1932 | 16/04/1932 | 57 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/10/1933 | 11/11/1933 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/05/1935 | 01/06/1935 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/11/1936 | 31/12/1936 | 34 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/10/1938 | 03/12/1938 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/05/1939 | 19/05/1939 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Doncaster Works | 30/11/1940 | 25/01/1941 | 57 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/07/1943 | 21/08/1943 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 31/03/1945 | 09/06/1945 | 71 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/05/1946 | 18/05/1946 | 1 day | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 14/04/1947 | 02/06/1947 | 50 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 23/04/1948 | 06/05/1948 | 14 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 62885 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/1910 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1455 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1279 |
||
1913 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1913. Dep: ?/03/1913. | ||
16/06/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 16/06/1922. Dep: 24/06/1922. | ||
19/10/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/10/1923. Dep: 12/01/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924 Tmp) number 1455N |
||
07/1925 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4455 | ||
02/12/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/12/1925. Dep: 03/03/1926. | ||
16/01/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/01/1928. Dep: 22/03/1928. | ||
26/11/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 26/11/1928. Dep: 03/12/1928. Work undertaken: Flaman speed recorder fitted |
||
02/03/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
21/03/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
12/10/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/10/1929. Dep: 09/11/1929. | ||
03/12/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Special) - Arr: 03/12/1931. Dep: 03/12/1931. Work undertaken: Flaman speed recorder removed |
||
20/02/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/02/1932. Dep: 16/04/1932. | ||
07/10/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/10/1933. Dep: 11/11/1933. | ||
04/05/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/05/1935. Dep: 01/06/1935. | ||
28/11/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/11/1936. Dep: 31/12/1936. | ||
29/10/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/10/1938. Dep: 03/12/1938. | ||
19/05/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Weighing) - Arr: 19/05/1939. Dep: 19/05/1939. | ||
30/11/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/11/1940. Dep: 25/01/1941. | ||
17/07/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/07/1943. Dep: 21/08/1943. | ||
31/03/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/03/1945. Dep: 09/06/1945. | ||
18/05/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/05/1946. Dep: 18/05/1946. | ||
21/07/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 2885 | ||
14/04/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/04/1947. Dep: 02/06/1947. | ||
23/04/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/04/1948. Dep: 06/05/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 62885 |
||
19/11/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF) | ||
23/01/1950 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 62885 |