Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 2281 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 20084 Week
» 73100 Month
» 192627 Year
» 3219480 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
1458 |
|
10/1910 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
4458 |
|
03/05/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2888 |
|
31/08/1946 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
C1 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
4-4-2 |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
263 |
Works Number |
1282 |
To Service |
During 10/1910 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 29/04/1947 |
Service Life |
36 yrs, 6 mths , 30 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
10/1910 |
NWE |
|
New England |
w/e |
22/01/1947 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
29/04/1947 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
NWE |
New England |
on |
22/01/1947 |
WDN |
NWE |
New England |
on |
29/04/1947 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1910 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1458 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1282 |
|
|
1913 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1913. Dep: ?/03/1913. |
|
|
13/07/1921 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/07/1921. Dep: 05/11/1921. |
|
|
09/01/1924 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/01/1924. Dep: 03/05/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4458
|
|
|
15/09/1924 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/09/1924. Dep: 04/10/1924. |
|
|
09/01/1926 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/01/1926. Dep: 13/04/1926. |
|
|
21/02/1928 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/02/1928. Dep: 24/05/1928. |
|
|
05/07/1930 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/07/1930. Dep: 09/08/1930. |
|
|
21/05/1932 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/05/1932. Dep: 02/07/1932. |
|
|
18/11/1933 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/11/1933. Dep: 23/12/1933. |
|
|
22/12/1934 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/12/1934. Dep: 26/01/1935. |
|
|
10/10/1936 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/10/1936. Dep: 07/11/1936. |
|
|
14/01/1939 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/01/1939. Dep: 11/02/1939. |
|
|
16/12/1939 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/12/1939. Dep: 10/02/1940. |
|
|
16/01/1943 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/01/1943. Dep: 20/02/1943. |
|
|
22/07/1944 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/07/1944. Dep: 12/08/1944. |
|
|
19/05/1945 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/05/1945. Dep: 16/06/1945. |
|
|
31/08/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2888 |
|
|
22/01/1947 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (NWE) |
|
|
17/03/1947 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (No repairs) - Arr: 17/03/1947. Dep: 17/03/1947. |
|
|
29/04/1947 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2888 |
|
|