Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1305 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14711 Week
» 67727 Month
» 187254 Year
» 3214107 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
1459 |
|
10/1910 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
4459 |
|
02/05/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2889 |
|
Not applied |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
C1 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
4-4-2 |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
263 |
Works Number |
1283 |
To Service |
During 10/1910 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 16/07/1943 |
Service Life |
32 yrs, 9 mths , 16 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
10/1910 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
16/07/1943 |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1910 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1459 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1283 |
|
|
03/03/1920 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/03/1920. Dep: 05/06/1920. |
|
|
02/01/1923 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/01/1923. Dep: 01/04/1923. |
|
|
05/02/1925 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/02/1925. Dep: 02/05/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4459
|
|
|
07/02/1927 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/02/1927. Dep: 09/05/1927. |
|
|
06/10/1928 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/10/1928. Dep: 08/12/1928. |
|
|
15/03/1930 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/03/1930. Dep: 19/04/1930. |
|
|
13/02/1932 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/02/1932. Dep: 12/03/1932. |
|
|
14/10/1933 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/10/1933. Dep: 25/11/1933. |
|
|
26/01/1935 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/01/1935. Dep: 16/02/1935. |
|
|
21/09/1935 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/09/1935. Dep: 19/10/1935. |
|
|
28/11/1936 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/11/1936. Dep: 26/12/1936. Work undertaken: Heating connection fittec to front end
|
|
|
05/08/1939 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/08/1939. Dep: 23/09/1939. |
|
|
07/12/1940 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/12/1940. Dep: 15/02/1941. |
|
|
12/06/1943 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (No repairs) - Arr: 12/06/1943. Dep: 12/06/1943. |
|
|
16/07/1943 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 4459 |
|
|
1946 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 2889 but not taken up |
|
|