Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 3000 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16406 Week
» 69422 Month
» 188949 Year
» 3215802 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Central Railway |
194 |
m/e |
12/1903 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
5194 |
m/e |
10/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2901 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
British Railways |
62901 |
m/e |
Not applied |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Robinson |
Class |
C4 |
Company History |
GCR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-4-2 |
Builder |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
Order Number |
9034 |
Works Number |
4540 |
To Service |
During 12/1903 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 28/11/1950 |
Service Life |
46 yrs, 11 mths , 29 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 12/1950 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
12/1903 |
BOS |
|
Boston |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
28/11/1950 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
LIN |
Lincoln |
on |
21/09/1947 |
ALLOC |
BOS |
Boston |
w/e |
01/11/1947 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
28/11/1950 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1903 |
To Service |
To service as Great Central Railway Number 194 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 4540 |
|
|
10/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5194 |
|
|
06/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2901 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Boston (BOS) |
|
|
1949 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 62901 but not taken up |
|
|
28/11/1950 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2901 |
|
|
12/1950 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|