Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 595 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14001 Week
» 67017 Month
» 186544 Year
» 3213397 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Central Railway |
264 |
m/e |
07/1904 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
5264 |
m/e |
02/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2903 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
62903 |
m/e |
Not applied |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Robinson |
Class |
C4 |
Company History |
GCR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-4-2 |
Builder |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
Order Number |
9233 |
Works Number |
4598 |
To Service |
During 07/1904 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 15/06/1949 |
Service Life |
44 yrs, 11 mths , 16 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 06/1949 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
07/1904 |
IMM |
|
Immingham |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
LIN |
|
Lincoln |
w/e |
02/10/1948 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
15/06/1949 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
LIN |
Lincoln |
on |
19/01/1947 |
ALLOC |
IMM |
Immingham |
w/e |
01/11/1947 |
ALLOC |
LIN |
Lincoln |
w/e |
02/10/1948 |
WDN |
LIN |
Lincoln |
on |
15/06/1949 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1904 |
To Service |
To service as Great Central Railway Number 264 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 4598 |
|
|
02/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5264 |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2903 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Immingham (IMM) |
|
|
02/10/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN) |
|
|
1949 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 62903 but not taken up |
|
|
06/1949 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
15/06/1949 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2903 |
|
|