Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 9 Online
» 108 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17911 Week
» 70927 Month
» 190454 Year
» 3217307 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Central Railway |
267 |
m/e |
07/1904 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
5267 |
m/e |
02/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2906 |
on |
24/03/1946 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Robinson |
Class |
C4 |
Company History |
GCR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-4-2 |
Builder |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
Order Number |
9233 |
Works Number |
4601 |
To Service |
During 07/1904 |
Withdrawal |
During 11/1947 |
Service Life |
43 yrs, 4 mths , 1 dy |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
07/1904 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
m/e |
11/1947 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
LIN |
Lincoln |
on |
07/09/1947 |
ALLOC |
BOS |
Boston |
on |
14/09/1947 |
WDN |
BOS |
Boston |
on |
20/11/1947 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1904 |
To Service |
To service as Great Central Railway Number 267 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 4601 |
|
|
02/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5267 |
|
|
24/03/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2906 |
|
|
11/1947 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2906 |
|
|