Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 2075 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19878 Week
» 72894 Month
» 192421 Year
» 3219274 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Central Railway |
1084 |
m/e |
10/1905 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
6084 |
m/e |
07/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2908 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
British Railways |
62908 |
m/e |
Not applied |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 11/1950 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
10/1905 |
LIN |
|
Lincoln |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
22/11/1950 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
IMM |
Immingham |
on |
27/04/1947 |
ALLOC |
LIN |
Lincoln |
on |
14/07/1947 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
22/11/1950 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1905 |
To Service |
To service as Great Central Railway Number 1084 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 16934 |
|
|
07/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 6084 |
|
|
06/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2908 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Lincoln (LIN) |
|
|
1949 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 62908 but not taken up |
|
|
11/1950 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
22/11/1950 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2908 |
|
|