Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 139 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 3282 Week
» 13452 Month
» 291248 Year
» 1175629 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 1088 m/e 10/1905
LNER (1924) 6088 m/e 11/1924
LNER (1946) 2912 m/e 09/1946
BR 62912 m/e Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class C4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
C4/210/1905
Wheels 4-4-2
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L130
Works Number 16938
To Service During 10/1905
Withdrawal Sun 07/08/1949
Scrapping During 08/1949
Service Life 43 yrs, 10 mths , 8 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
LIN Lincoln 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
   Withdrawn 07/08/1949

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC CLK Colwick 08/12/1946
ALLOC IMM Immingham 19/01/1947
ALLOC LIN Lincoln 14/07/1947
WDN LIN Lincoln 07/08/1949

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1905 To Service To service as GCR Number 1088
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 16938
   
11/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 6088    
09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 2912    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Lincoln (LIN)    
1949 Number Allocated Allocated number 62912 but not taken up    
07/08/1949 Withdrawn Condemned as 2912    

prev prev