Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 990 Today
» 1016 Yesterday
» 6137 Week
» 16307 Month
» 294103 Year
» 1178484 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 1091 m/e 11/1905
LNER (1924) 6091 m/e 04/1925
LNER (1946) 2914 m/e 06/1946
BR 62914 m/e Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class C4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
C4/211/1905
Wheels 4-4-2
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L130
Works Number 16941
To Service During 11/1905
Withdrawal Sat 20/03/1948
Scrapping During 03/1948
Service Life 42 yrs, 4 mths , 18 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
LIN Lincoln 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
   Withdrawn 20/03/1948

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC LIN Lincoln 19/01/1947
WDN LIN Lincoln 15/03/1948

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1905 To Service To service as GCR Number 1091
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 16941
   
04/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 6091    
06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 2914    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Lincoln (LIN)    
20/03/1948 Withdrawn Condemned as 2914    
1949 Number Allocated Allocated number 62914 but not taken up    

prev prev