Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 5 Today
» 828 Yesterday
» 3393 Week
» 16426 Month
» 238827 Year
» 1123208 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 1094 m/e 11/1905
LNER (1924) 6094 m/e 02/1924
LNER (1946) 2917 m/e 08/1946
BR 62917 m/e Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class C4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
C4/211/1905
Wheels 4-4-2
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L130
Works Number 16944
To Service During 11/1905
Withdrawal Thu 12/05/1949
Scrapping During 05/1949
Service Life 43 yrs, 6 mths , 11 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
LIN Lincoln 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
   Withdrawn 12/05/1949

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC IMM Immingham 08/12/1946
ALLOC LIN Lincoln 14/07/1947
WDN LIN Lincoln 12/05/1949

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1905 To Service To service as GCR Number 1094
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 16944
   
02/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 6094    
08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 2917    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Lincoln (LIN)    
1949 Number Allocated Allocated number 62917 but not taken up    
12/05/1949 Withdrawn Condemned as 2917    

prev prev