Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 29 Online
» 1548 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 15591 Week
» 80545 Month
» 283209 Year
» 3310062 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Central Railway |
1094 |
m/e |
11/1905 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
6094 |
m/e |
02/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2917 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
British Railways |
62917 |
m/e |
Not applied |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 05/1949 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
11/1905 |
LIN |
|
Lincoln |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
12/05/1949 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
IMM |
Immingham |
on |
08/12/1946 |
ALLOC |
LIN |
Lincoln |
on |
14/07/1947 |
WDN |
LIN |
Lincoln |
on |
12/05/1949 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1905 |
To Service |
To service as Great Central Railway Number 1094 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 16944 |
|
|
02/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 6094 |
|
|
08/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2917 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Lincoln (LIN) |
|
|
1949 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 62917 but not taken up |
|
|
05/1949 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
12/05/1949 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2917 |
|
|