Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 61 Today
» 1116 Yesterday
» 61 Week
» 14318 Month
» 242202 Year
» 1463767 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 358 m/e 05/1906
LNER (1924) 5358 m/e 03/1925
LNER (1946) 2921 m/e 09/1946
BR 62921 m/e Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class C4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
C4/205/1906
Wheels 4-4-2
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
To Service During 05/1906
Withdrawal Mon 05/04/1948
Scrapping During 04/1948
Service Life 41 yrs, 11 mths , 6 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 05/1906
BOS Boston 01/01/1948
   Withdrawn 05/04/1948

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC LIN Lincoln 14/07/1947
WDN NOR Norwich Thorpe 09/08/1947
ALLOC BOS Boston w/e 01/11/1947
WDN BOS Boston 05/04/1948

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
25/09/1947 Stratford Works The following withdrawn locos. were noted in the vicinity of the stripping shop on 25/9: 'F3' 7118/21/29/38/45; 'B12/3' 1522; 'D16/3' 2500; 'J15' 5358 an 5403 (all stripped), whilst 7125 an 7148 were intact. Other locos. stripped were: 'J15' 5402/54; 'D16' 2535; 'J17' 5541/71. In the stripping shop were: 'E4' 2784; 'J15' 5472; 'J19/2' 4675 and 'J17' 5549. In the Paint shop were the 'Coffee Pot' 'Y5' 8081 and W.D. 77416. A curious sight was the crane tank shed filled by two W.D.'s 77119 an 77312 (the latter with a 15A shed plate). In the fields behind the New Works were 'F3' 7146; 'J70' 8225; 'H2' 7512; 'D16' 2591; 'B12' 1544 and 'J39' 4841, all awaiting works. W.D. 77476 was in the New Works, and W.D.'s 77302 and 77107 were in the shed yard. 'D16' 2584; 'J20' 4677/93; 'J39' 4708/61, 'J69' 8574/8632; 'F6' 7230 and 'F4' 7162 were all noted newly painted ex-works. 7162 was fitted with a tablet-catcher. SLS/194711

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1906 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 358
Built at Gorton Works
   
03/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 5358    
09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 2921    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Boston (BOS)    
05/04/1948 Withdrawn Condemned as 2921    
1949 Number Allocated Allocated number 62921 but not taken up    

prev prev