Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 763 Today
» 1219 Yesterday
» 3273 Week
» 35062 Month
» 183827 Year
» 1405392 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 361 m/e 07/1906
LNER (1924) 5361 m/e 10/1925
LNER (1946) 2923 m/e 08/1946
BR 62923 m/e Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class C4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
C4/207/1906
Wheels 4-4-2
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
To Service During 07/1906
Withdrawal Fri 04/02/1949
Scrapping During 02/1949
Service Life 42 yrs, 7 mths , 5 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 07/1906
BOS Boston 01/01/1948
   Withdrawn 04/02/1949

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC LIN Lincoln 07/09/1947
ALLOC BOS Boston 14/09/1947
WDN BOS Boston 04/02/1949

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1906 To Service To service as GCR Number 361
Built at Gorton Works
   
10/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 5361    
08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 2923    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Boston (BOS)    
1949 Number Allocated Allocated number 62923 but not taken up    
04/02/1949 Withdrawn Condemned as 2923    

prev prev