Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 572 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 3715 Week
» 13885 Month
» 291681 Year
» 1176062 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 258   12/1905
LNER (1924) 5258   28/02/1925
LNER (1946) 2895   23/06/1946

Names Carried
Date From Name
06/1909 THE RT. HON. VISCOUNT CROSS G.C.B. G.C.S.I.

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class C5
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 4-4-2
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
To Service During 12/1905
Withdrawal Tue 31/12/1946
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)
Service Life 41 yrs, 1 mth , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
LEI Leicester (G.C.) 08/04/1921
IMM Immingham 17/05/1933
   Withdrawn 31/12/1946

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1905 Diagram 15 boiler fitted
05/08/1911 Diagram 15 boiler fitted
08/06/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted
18/12/1920 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1492)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 03/06/1911 05/08/1911 64 days General
Boiler number 1148 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 25/08/1917 08/06/1918 288 days General
Boiler number 1149 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 07/08/1920 18/12/1920 134 days General
Boiler number 1492 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 14/10/1922 09/12/1922 57 days General  
Gorton Works 29/11/1924 28/02/1925 92 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5258
 
Gorton Works 08/10/1927 10/12/1927 64 days General
Superheated boiler fitted
Boiler number 1461 (Diagram 15Sup)
 
Gorton Works 24/08/1929 02/11/1929 71 days General
Boiler number 1875 (Diagram 15Sup)
 
Gorton Works 30/08/1930 18/10/1930 50 days General  
Gorton Works 30/07/1932 03/09/1932 36 days General
Boiler number 1078 (Diagram 15Sup)
 
Gorton Works 18/11/1933 18/11/1933 1 day Light Repair
Front heating connection fitted
 
Gorton Works 09/02/1935 30/03/1935 50 days General
Boiler number 1850 (Diagram 15Sup)
 
Gorton Works 29/08/1936 03/10/1936 36 days General
Chimney change
Boiler number 512 (Diagram 15Sup)
 
Gorton Works 26/11/1938 24/12/1938 29 days General  
Gorton Works 01/03/1941 29/03/1941 29 days General
Boiler number 871 (Diagram 15Sup)
 
Gorton Works 28/04/1943 05/06/1943 39 days General
Boiler number 3209 (Diagram 15Sup)
 
Gorton Works 02/09/1943 04/09/1943 3 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 01/12/1945 05/01/1946 36 days General
Boiler number 3314 (Diagram 15Sup)
 
Gorton Works 07/12/1946 07/12/1946 1 day -+NR
LH cylinder fractured
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also

prev