Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 1044 Today
» 1293 Yesterday
» 7251 Week
» 4764 Month
» 232648 Year
» 1454213 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 259   02/1906
LNER (1924) 5259   19/04/1924
LNER (1946) 2896   23/06/1946

Names Carried
Date From Name
11/1906 KING EDWARD VII

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class C5
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 4-4-2
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
To Service During 02/1906
Withdrawal Fri 11/04/1947
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)
Service Life 41 yrs, 2 mths , 11 dys

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 12/4/47

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 02/1906
LEI Leicester (G.C.) 04/03/1921
LIN Lincoln 28/11/1932
IMM Immingham 28/12/1932
   Withdrawn 11/04/1947

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN IMM Immingham 11/04/1947

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
02/1906 Diagram 15 boiler fitted
18/01/1913 Diagram 15 boiler fitted
22/10/1921 Ross Pop


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 23/11/1912 18/01/1913 57 days General
Boiler number 1175 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 24/09/1921 22/10/1921 29 days General
Ross Pop
 
Gorton Works 02/02/1924 19/04/1924 78 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5259
 
Gorton Works 13/09/1924 11/10/1924 29 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 05/12/1925 20/02/1926 78 days General  
Gorton Works 01/05/1926 28/08/1926 120 days General
After casualty
 
Gorton Works 14/05/1927 23/07/1927 71 days General  
Gorton Works 29/11/1928 23/03/1929 115 days General  
Gorton Works 09/11/1929 18/01/1930 71 days General  
Gorton Works 13/02/1932 05/03/1932 22 days General  
Gorton Works 10/03/1934 14/04/1934 36 days General  
Gorton Works 07/03/1936 04/04/1936 29 days General
Chimney change
 
Gorton Works 15/01/1938 12/02/1938 29 days General  
Gorton Works 14/12/1940 08/03/1941 85 days General  
Gorton Works 13/08/1943 02/10/1943 51 days General  
Gorton Works 06/10/1945 10/11/1945 36 days General  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1906 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 259
Built at Gorton Works
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
11/1906 Naming Named 'KING EDWARD VII'    
23/11/1912 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/11/1912. Dep: 18/01/1913.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1175 (Diagram 15)
   
04/03/1921 Allocation Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (LEI)    
24/09/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/09/1921. Dep: 22/10/1921.
Work undertaken:
Ross Pop
   
02/02/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/02/1924. Dep: 19/04/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5259
   
13/09/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/09/1924. Dep: 11/10/1924.    
05/12/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/12/1925. Dep: 20/02/1926.    
01/05/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/05/1926. Dep: 28/08/1926.
Work undertaken:
After casualty
   
14/05/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/05/1927. Dep: 23/07/1927.    
29/11/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/11/1928. Dep: 23/03/1929.    
09/11/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/11/1929. Dep: 18/01/1930.    
13/02/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/02/1932. Dep: 05/03/1932.    
28/11/1932 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN)    
28/12/1932 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
10/03/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/03/1934. Dep: 14/04/1934.    
07/03/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/03/1936. Dep: 04/04/1936.
Work undertaken:
Chimney change
   
15/01/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/01/1938. Dep: 12/02/1938.    
14/12/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/12/1940. Dep: 08/03/1941.    
13/08/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/08/1943. Dep: 02/10/1943.    
06/10/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/10/1945. Dep: 10/11/1945.    
23/06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 2896    
11/04/1947 Withdrawn Condemned as 2896    

prev prev