Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 233 Today
» 1011 Yesterday
» 233 Week
» 17569 Month
» 295365 Year
» 1179746 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 364   12/1906
LNER (1924) 5364   05/12/1925
LNER (1946) 2897   03/11/1946

Names Carried
Date From Name
03/1907 LADY HENDERSON
1917 LADY FARINGDON

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class C5
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 4-4-2
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
To Service During 12/1906
Withdrawal Wed 31/12/1947
Scrapping Carriage Works (Dukinfield)
Service Life 41 yrs, 1 mth , 1 dy

Notes
Notes Cut up at Dukinfield 3/48

Allocations
Code Name From Date
LEI Leicester (G.C.) 17/09/1920
SHF Sheffield Neepsend m/e 05/1923
LEI Leicester (G.C.) 28/01/1932
IMM Immingham 27/05/1933
   Withdrawn 31/12/1947

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN IMM Immingham 31/12/1947

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1906 Diagram 15 boiler fitted
18/03/1911 Diagram 15 boiler fitted


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 03/02/1911 18/03/1911 44 days General
Boiler number 1182 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 11/01/1913 01/03/1913 50 days General
Superheated boiler fitted
Boiler number 629 (Diagram 15Sup)
 
Gorton Works 06/03/1920 01/05/1920 57 days General
Boiler number 1851 (Diagram 15Sup)
 
Gorton Works 30/12/1922 03/03/1923 64 days General  
Gorton Works 06/06/1925 05/12/1925 183 days General
Boiler number 139 (Diagram 15Sup)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5364
 
Gorton Works 01/01/1927 09/04/1927 99 days General  
Gorton Works 23/02/1929 06/04/1929 43 days General  
Gorton Works 28/02/1931 04/04/1931 36 days General
Boiler number 1868 (Diagram 15Sup)
 
Gorton Works 29/04/1933 27/05/1933 29 days General
Boiler number 1263 (Diagram 15Sup)
 
Gorton Works 16/12/1933 23/12/1933 8 days Light Repair
Front heating connection fitted
 
Gorton Works 11/05/1935 08/06/1935 29 days General
Boiler number 1863 (Diagram 15Sup)
 
Gorton Works 27/03/1937 17/04/1937 22 days General
Boiler number 3283 (Diagram 15Sup)
 
Gorton Works 10/12/1938 21/01/1939 43 days General  
Gorton Works 12/04/1941 28/06/1941 78 days General  
Gorton Works 17/11/1941 31/01/1942 76 days Light Repair
Afer collision
 
Gorton Works 26/10/1943 20/11/1943 26 days General
Boiler number 1250 (Diagram 15Sup)
 
Gorton Works 15/12/1945 26/01/1946 43 days General
Boiler number 3209 (Diagram 15Sup)
 
Gorton Works 31/12/1947 31/12/1947 1 day -+NR  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also

prev prev