|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 03/02/1911 | 18/03/1911 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 1182 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/01/1913 | 01/03/1913 | 50 days | General | Superheated boiler fitted |
||
Gorton Works | 06/03/1920 | 01/05/1920 | 57 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 30/12/1922 | 03/03/1923 | 64 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 06/06/1925 | 05/12/1925 | 183 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5364 |
||
Gorton Works | 01/01/1927 | 09/04/1927 | 99 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 23/02/1929 | 06/04/1929 | 43 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 28/02/1931 | 04/04/1931 | 36 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 29/04/1933 | 27/05/1933 | 29 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 16/12/1933 | 23/12/1933 | 8 days | Light Repair | Front heating connection fitted |
||
Gorton Works | 11/05/1935 | 08/06/1935 | 29 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 27/03/1937 | 17/04/1937 | 22 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 10/12/1938 | 21/01/1939 | 43 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 12/04/1941 | 28/06/1941 | 78 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 17/11/1941 | 31/01/1942 | 76 days | Light Repair | Afer collision |
||
Gorton Works | 26/10/1943 | 20/11/1943 | 26 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 15/12/1945 | 26/01/1946 | 43 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 31/12/1947 | 31/12/1947 | 1 day | -+NR |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/1906 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 364 Built at Gorton Works Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
03/1907 | Naming | Named 'LADY HENDERSON' | ||
03/02/1911 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/02/1911. Dep: 18/03/1911. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1182 (Diagram 15) |
||
11/01/1913 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/01/1913. Dep: 01/03/1913. Work undertaken: Superheated boiler fitted |
||
1917 | Naming | Renamed 'LADY FARINGDON' | ||
06/03/1920 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/03/1920. Dep: 01/05/1920. | ||
17/09/1920 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (LEI) | ||
30/12/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/12/1922. Dep: 03/03/1923. | ||
05/1923 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF) | ||
06/06/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/06/1925. Dep: 05/12/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5364 |
||
01/01/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/01/1927. Dep: 09/04/1927. | ||
23/02/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/02/1929. Dep: 06/04/1929. | ||
28/02/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/02/1931. Dep: 04/04/1931. | ||
28/01/1932 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (LEI) | ||
29/04/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/04/1933. Dep: 27/05/1933. | ||
27/05/1933 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
16/12/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/12/1933. Dep: 23/12/1933. Work undertaken: Front heating connection fitted |
||
11/05/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/05/1935. Dep: 08/06/1935. | ||
27/03/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/03/1937. Dep: 17/04/1937. | ||
10/12/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/12/1938. Dep: 21/01/1939. | ||
12/04/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/04/1941. Dep: 28/06/1941. | ||
17/11/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/11/1941. Dep: 31/01/1942. Work undertaken: Afer collision |
||
26/10/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/10/1943. Dep: 20/11/1943. | ||
15/12/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/12/1945. Dep: 26/01/1946. | ||
03/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 2897 | ||
31/12/1947 | Works Visit | |||
31/12/1947 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 2897 |