Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 479 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 19390 Week
» 84344 Month
» 287008 Year
» 3313861 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
1013 |
m/e |
05/1898 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
4013 |
m/e |
03/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
7352 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
67352 |
m/e |
07/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
C12 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
4-4-2T |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
205 |
Works Number |
757 |
To Service |
During 05/1898 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 19/11/1958 |
Service Life |
60 yrs, 6 mths , 20 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 01/1959 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
04/10/1958 |
E.R. locomotive news |
C12 67352 is now acting as Station pilot, Grantham and is ex-works, fully lined out; J52 68846 is ex-works, fully lined out at Hornsey; L.T.S.R. 4-4-2T 41969 is ex-works in unlined black at Plaistow; 61632, Belvoir Castle has been renamed Royal Sovereign and was ex-Stratford mid-October whilst 61671 was still in scrap yard with nameplates Royal Sovereign. |
SLS/195811 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1898 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1013 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 757 |
|
|
03/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4013 |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7352 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Louth (LTH) |
|
|
07/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 67352 |
|
|
25/07/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (53B) |
|
|
23/04/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (35A) |
|
|
17/12/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Spital Bridge (35C) |
|
|
20/07/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Grantham (35B) |
|
|
19/11/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 67352 |
|
|
01/1959 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|