Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1138 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18941 Week
» 71957 Month
» 191484 Year
» 3218337 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
1502 |
m/e |
03/1899 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
4502 |
m/e |
07/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
7360 |
m/e |
04/1946 |
British Railways |
67360 |
m/e |
05/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
C12 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
4-4-2T |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
212 |
Works Number |
813 |
To Service |
During 03/1899 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Mon 24/01/1955 |
Service Life |
55 yrs, 10 mths , 26 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 01/1955 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
31E |
Bury St Edmunds |
4w/e |
01/11/1952 |
ALLOC |
31A |
Cambridge |
4w/e |
08/08/1953 |
ALLOC |
31C |
Kings Lynn |
4w/e |
31/10/1953 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
24/01/1955 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
07/1921 |
Condensers removed |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1899 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1502 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 813 |
|
|
07/1921 |
Modification |
Modification: Condensers removed |
|
|
07/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4502 |
|
|
04/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7360 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Cambridge (CAM) |
|
|
05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 67360 |
|
|
01/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bury St Edmunds (31E) |
|
|
15/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bury St Edmunds (31E) |
|
|
25/07/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
24/10/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C) |
|
|
01/1955 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
24/01/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 67360 |
|
|