Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 151 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 151 Week
» 18933 Month
» 267226 Year
» 1151607 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GNR 1502 m/e 03/1899
LNER (1924) 4502 m/e 07/1925
LNER (1946) 7360 m/e 04/1946
BR 67360 m/e 05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class C12
Company History GNR/LNER
Wheels 4-4-2T
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 212
Works Number 813
To Service During 03/1899
Withdrawal w/e Mon 24/01/1955
Scrapping During 01/1955
Service Life 55 yrs, 10 mths , 26 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
CAM Cambridge 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
31E Bury St Edmunds 4w/e 15/11/1952
31A Cambridge 4w/e 25/07/1953
31C Kings Lynn 4w/e 24/10/1953
   Withdrawn w/e 24/01/1955

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 31E Bury St Edmunds 4w/e 01/11/1952
ALLOC 31A Cambridge 4w/e 08/08/1953
ALLOC 31C Kings Lynn 4w/e 31/10/1953
WDN   w/e 24/01/1955

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/1921 Condensers removed


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1899 To Service To service as GNR Number 1502
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 813
   
07/1921 Modification Modification: Condensers removed    
07/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 4502    
04/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7360    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Cambridge (CAM)    
05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 67360    
15/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Bury St Edmunds (31E)    
25/07/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
24/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C)    
01/1955 Withdrawn Condemned as 67360    

prev prev