Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 2912 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16318 Week
» 69334 Month
» 188861 Year
» 3215714 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
1504 |
m/e |
03/1899 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
4504 |
m/e |
08/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
7362 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
British Railways |
67362 |
m/e |
08/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
C12 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
4-4-2T |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
212 |
Works Number |
815 |
To Service |
During 03/1899 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 11/01/1958 |
Service Life |
58 yrs, 10 mths , 13 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 01/1958 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
35C |
Spital Bridge |
w/e |
20/08/1950 |
ALLOC |
35B |
Grantham |
4w/e |
22/05/1954 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
11/01/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
08/1924 |
Condensers removed |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1899 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1504 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 815 |
|
|
08/1924 |
Modification |
Modification: Condensers removed |
|
|
08/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4504 |
|
|
05/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7362 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - New England (NWE) |
|
|
08/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 67362 |
|
|
20/08/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Spital Bridge (35C) |
|
|
22/05/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Grantham (35B) |
|
|
01/1958 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
11/01/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 67362 |
|
|