Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 10 Online
» 759 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14165 Week
» 67181 Month
» 186708 Year
» 3213561 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
1505 |
m/e |
04/1899 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
4505 |
m/e |
12/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
7363 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
British Railways |
67363 |
m/e |
02/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
C12 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
4-4-2T |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
212 |
Works Number |
816 |
To Service |
During 04/1899 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 20/11/1958 |
Service Life |
59 yrs, 7 mths , 20 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 11/1958 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
ANN |
Annesley |
w/e |
26/02/1949 |
ALLOC |
30A |
Stratford |
4w/e |
13/06/1953 |
ALLOC |
38B |
Annesley |
4w/e |
05/09/1953 |
ALLOC |
33B |
Tilbury |
4w/e |
10/11/1956 |
ALLOC |
34E |
New England |
4w/e |
06/09/1958 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
20/11/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
12/1924 |
Condensers removed |
02/1949 |
Push/Pull equipment fitted |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
09/08/1958 |
Peterborough MPD |
C12 67398 has been working the Stamford branch with the N5s and C12 67363 has arrived as spare; however N7s 69635/46 have replaced N5s and more are expected as the N5s are withdrawn. |
SLS/195810 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1899 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1505 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 816 |
|
|
12/1924 |
Modification |
Modification: Condensers removed |
|
|
12/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4505 |
|
|
05/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7363 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - New England (NWE) |
|
|
02/1949 |
Modification |
Modification: Push/Pull equipment fitted |
|
|
02/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 67363 |
|
|
26/02/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) |
|
|
20/06/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
19/09/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Annesley (38B) |
|
|
20/10/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tilbury (33B) |
|
|
13/09/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (34E) |
|
|
11/1958 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
20/11/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 67363 |
|
|