Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 214 Today
» 1073 Yesterday
» 214 Week
» 11785 Month
» 260078 Year
» 1144459 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GNR 1509 m/e 05/1899
LNER (1924) 4509 m/e 10/1926
LNER (1946) 7367 m/e 05/1946
BR 67367 m/e 02/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class C12
Company History GNR/LNER
Wheels 4-4-2T
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 212
Works Number 820
To Service During 05/1899
Withdrawal Wed 06/08/1958
Scrapping During 08/1958
Service Life 59 yrs, 3 mths , 7 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
CAM Cambridge 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
31E Bury St Edmunds 4w/e 15/11/1952
31A Cambridge 4w/e 25/07/1953
31C Kings Lynn 4w/e 21/11/1953
31A Cambridge 5w/e 17/12/1955
35C Spital Bridge 5w/e 20/04/1957
35B Grantham 5w/e 20/07/1957
   Withdrawn 06/08/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC IFS   w/e 13/08/1949
ALLOC CAM Cambridge w/e 15/10/1949
ALLOC 31E Bury St Edmunds 4w/e 01/11/1952
ALLOC 31A Cambridge 4w/e 08/08/1953
ALLOC 31C Kings Lynn 4w/e 28/11/1953
ALLOC 31A Cambridge 4w/e 03/12/1955
ALLOC 35C Spital Bridge 4w/e 20/04/1957
ALLOC 35B Grantham 4w/e 13/07/1957
WDN   06/08/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
01/1924 Condensers removed


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1899 To Service To service as GNR Number 1509
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 820
   
01/1924 Modification Modification: Condensers removed    
10/1926 Renumbered Renumbered to 4509    
05/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7367    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Cambridge (CAM)    
02/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 67367    
15/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Bury St Edmunds (31E)    
25/07/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
21/11/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C)    
17/12/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
20/04/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Spital Bridge (35C)    
20/07/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Grantham (35B)    
08/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 67367    

prev prev