Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 175 Today
» 1015 Yesterday
» 4343 Week
» 19457 Month
» 322647 Year
» 1544212 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Northern Railway 1511 m/e 08/1899
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 4511 m/e 07/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 7369 m/e 10/1946
British Railways 67369 m/e 01/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class C12
Company History GNR/LNER
Wheels 4-4-2T
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 214
Works Number 832
To Service During 08/1899
Withdrawal Mon 19/07/1954
Scrapping During 07/1954
Service Life 54 yrs, 11 mths , 18 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 08/1899
TFD Trafford Park (LNER) on 01/01/1948
35A New England 4w/e 14/02/1953
   Withdrawn on 19/07/1954

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
EXLOAN 35A New England 4w/e 21/02/1953
WDN   on 19/07/1954

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/1921 Condensers removed


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1899 To Service To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1511
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 832
   
03/1921 Modification Modification: Condensers removed    
07/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 4511    
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7369    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD)    
01/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 67369    
14/02/1953 Allocation Reallocated to New England (35A)    
19/07/1954 Withdrawn Condemned as 67369    

prev prev