Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 132 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17935 Week
» 70951 Month
» 190478 Year
» 3217331 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
1511 |
m/e |
08/1899 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
4511 |
m/e |
07/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
7369 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
67369 |
m/e |
01/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
C12 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
4-4-2T |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
214 |
Works Number |
832 |
To Service |
During 08/1899 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 19/07/1954 |
Service Life |
54 yrs, 11 mths , 18 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 07/1954 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
EXLOAN |
35A |
New England |
4w/e |
21/02/1953 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
19/07/1954 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
03/1921 |
Condensers removed |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
24/08/1954 |
Doncaster Works (scrap roads) |
On 24/8/54 a visit to the new erecting shop at Doncaster Works revealed the first two (80106-7) of the batch of ten BR standard 2-6-4Ts in early stages of construction and the frames set up for the third (80108). Among engines in the scrap roads, either being cut up or awaiting decision, were 67369 (C12), 67412 (C13), 65002 (J1), 65020 (J2), 65493/95 (J5), 68854/59 (J52), and 69437/82 (N1). A2/1 60507 (64B) was resplendent outside the paint 'shop after general repair. |
SLS/195410 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1899 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1511 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 832 |
|
|
03/1921 |
Modification |
Modification: Condensers removed |
|
|
07/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4511 |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7369 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD) |
|
|
01/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 67369 |
|
|
14/02/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (35A) |
|
|
07/1954 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
19/07/1954 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 67369 |
|
|